PA SB506 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Act No. 61 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in incapacitated persons, further providing for petition and hearing and independent evaluation, for determination of incapacity and appointment of guardian and for review hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In incapacitated persons, further providing for petition and hearing and independent evaluation, for determination of incapacity and appointment of guardian and for review hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 506 PN 843, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 506 PN 843, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00789 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00783 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-14HouseAct No. 61 of 2023
2023-12-14HouseApproved by the Governor
2023-12-14HousePresented to the Governor
2023-12-13HouseSigned in House
2023-12-13HouseSigned in Senate
2023-12-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2023-12-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-12-12HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-12-12HouseSecond consideration
2023-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2023-06-29HouseLaid on the table
2023-06-29HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-29HouseReported as committed
2023-06-27HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2023-06-26HouseIn the House
2023-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2023-06-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2023-06-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-06-07SenateSecond consideration
2023-06-06SenateFirst consideration
2023-06-06SenateReported as amended
2023-03-07SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=506
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0506&pn=0398
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0506&pn=0843
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0506&pn=0398&aYear=2023&an=00789
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0506&pn=0398&aYear=2023&an=00783
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/SB0506P0843.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/SB0506P0843.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/06/2023&RollCallId=222
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/06/2023&RollCallId=221
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/06/2023&RollCallId=220
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2023&RollCallId=335
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=160
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=60&theDate=06/29/2023&RollCallId=740
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=831
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=12/13/2023&RollCallId=1252

Bill Comments

feedback