PA SB504 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Title
In procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |