PA SB503 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 28, 1935 (P.L.477, No.193), referred to as the Enforcement Officer Disability Benefits Law, further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.
Title
Further providing for disability benefits and for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 503 PN 1587, 2021 A4923 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03957 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03887 (Y: 4 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03882 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 503 PN 527, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03957 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03887 (Y: 4 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-12 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03882 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 503 PN 527, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-06-15 | House | In the House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |