PA SB497 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House Floor: SB 497 PN 876, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 497 PN 876, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 497 PN 876, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Act No. 7 |
2018-02-15 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-02-05 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed in House |
2018-01-24 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-01-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-01-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-01-23 | House | Second consideration |
2018-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-12 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-05 | House | In the House |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |