PA SB494 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in collective bargaining, further providing for definitions and prohibiting full-time union leave.
Title
In collective bargaining, further providing for definitions and prohibiting full-time union leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |