PA SB492 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in requirements and prohibitions, providing for Pennsylvania Interscholastic Athletic Association; in access, further providing for open-records officer, for appeals officer, for regulations and policies, for requests and for retention of records; in procedure, further providing, for requests, for written requests, for electronic access, for creation of record, for production of certain records and for exceptions for public records; in agency response, further providing for general rule and for extension of time; in appeal of agency determination, further providing for filing of appeal and for appeals officers; in judicial review, further providing for civil penalty and for Office of Open Records; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for relation to other laws.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in requirements and prohibitions, providing for Pennsylvania Interscholastic Athletic Association; in access, further providing for open-records officer, for appeals officer, for regulations and policies, for requests and for retention of records; in procedure, further providing, for requests, for written requests, for electronic access, for creation of record, for production of certain records and for exceptions for public records; in agency response, further providing for general rule and for extension of time; in appeal of agency determination, further providing for filing of appeal and for appeals officers; in judicial review, further providing for civil penalty and for Office of Open Records; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for relation to other laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A05588 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |