PA SB480 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in associations and organizations, further providing for associations and organizations for mayors; in elections of officers, further providing for eligibility; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for appointments and incompatible offices and for police serving under cooperative agreement or contract; in corporate powers, further providing for specific powers; in taxation and finance, further providing for investment of funds; providing for solid waste collection and disposition; and, in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions and for publication.
Title
In associations and organizations, further providing for associations and organizations for mayors; in elections of officers, further providing for eligibility; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for appointments and incompatible offices and for police serving under cooperative agreement or contract; in corporate powers, further providing for specific powers; in taxation and finance, further providing for investment of funds; providing for solid waste collection and disposition; and, in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions and for publication.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: SB 480 PN 505, 2021 A4353 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 480 PN 505, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 480 PN 505, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-24 | House | In the House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |