PA SB473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of sale of tobacco and for the offense of use of tobacco in schools; and, in preemptions relating to municipalities, further providing for tobacco.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In minors, further providing for the offense of sale of tobacco and for the offense of use of tobacco in schools; and, in preemptions relating to municipalities, further providing for tobacco.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 473 PN 1407, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 473 PN 1407, FP (Y: 135 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 473 PN 1190, 2019 A4100, ROTHMAN (Y: 112 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 473 PN 1190, 2019 A3985, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 172 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 473 PN 1190, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateAct No. 111
2019-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-11-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-11-21SenateSigned in House
2019-11-21SenateSigned in Senate
2019-11-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (44-5)
2019-11-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-11-21SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (135-49)
2019-11-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as committed
2019-10-29HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES
2019-09-25HouseIn the House
2019-09-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-6)
2019-09-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-09-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-09-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-23SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-03-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=473
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0473&pn=0478
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0473&pn=1052
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0473&pn=1190
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0473&pn=1407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=393
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=264
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=878
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=934
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=1450
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=687

Bill Comments

feedback