PA SB471 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in real property, providing for real estate foreclosure of vacant and abandoned property and for sheriff's commission and credit or attorney fees.
Title
In real property, providing for real estate foreclosure of vacant and abandoned property and for sheriff's commission and credit or attorney fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |