PA SB462 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, repealing provisions relating to report of racial and ethnic groupings and to study of public schools that provide Internet instruction; in school districts, repealing provisions relating to corporate seal, to submission of plans, to disapproval of plans, to Department of Public Instruction to prepare plans, to establishment of reorganized school districts and to advance establishment; in duties and powers of boards of school directors, repealing provisions relating to special school watchmen-school districts in townships of the second class, to copies of school laws and to educational broadcasting; in grounds and buildings, repealing provisions relating to residences for teachers and janitors, to heating stoves to be shielded, to ventilation and thermometer, to fireproof construction, to doors to open outward and fire escapes, etc., to completion of abandoned WPA projects in districts of the third and fourth class and to condition of grounds and shade trees; in certification of teachers, repealing provisions relating to summer schools, etc.; in pupils and attendance, repealing provisions relating to possession of telephone pagers prohibited, to nonprofit school food program, to antitruancy programs and to medical care for children under six with defective hearing; in safe schools, repealing provisions relating to report; in school health services, repealing provisions relating to care and treatment of pupils and to local wellness policy; in terms and courses of study, repealing provisions relating to foreign language academies, to monthly reports to school directors of the districts second, third and fourth class, to Read to Succeed Program and to department duties and powers; in vocational education, repealing provisions relating to schools or classes, supervisors, principals, instructors, etc., to estimate of expenses and reimbursements and appropriations and to teachers of evening schools; in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, repealing provisions relating to duties of public institutions of higher education; repealing provisions relating to medical education loan assistance; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, repealing provisions relating to special study on the revenue impact of out-of-State tax credits.
Title
In preliminary provisions, repealing provisions relating to report of racial and ethnic groupings and to study of public schools that provide Internet instruction; in school districts, repealing provisions relating to corporate seal, to submission of plans, to disapproval of plans, to Department of Public Instruction to prepare plans, to establishment of reorganized school districts and to advance establishment; in duties and powers of boards of school directors, repealing provisions relating to special school watchmen-school districts in townships of the second class, to copies of school laws and to educational broadcasting; in grounds and buildings, repealing provisions relating to residences for teachers and janitors, to heating stoves to be shielded, to ventilation and thermometer, to fireproof construction, to doors to open outward and fire escapes, etc., to completion of abandoned WPA projects in districts of the third and fourth class and to condition of grounds and shade trees; in certification of teachers, repealing provisions relating to summer schools, etc.; in pupils and attendance, repealing provisions relating to possession of telephone pagers prohibited, to nonprofit school food program, to antitruancy programs and to medical care for children under six with defective hearing; in safe schools, repealing provisions relating to report; in school health services, repealing provisions relating to care and treatment of pupils and to local wellness policy; in terms and courses of study, repealing provisions relating to foreign language academies, to monthly reports to school directors of the districts second, third and fourth class, to Read to Succeed Program and to department duties and powers; in vocational education, repealing provisions relating to schools or classes, supervisors, principals, instructors, etc., to estimate of expenses and reimbursements and appropriations and to teachers of evening schools; in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, repealing provisions relating to duties of public institutions of higher education; repealing provisions relating to medical education loan assistance; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, repealing provisions relating to special study on the revenue impact of out-of-State tax credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 462 PN 858, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 462 PN 858, A4837, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-4837 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 462 PN 858, A4837, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-4837 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-04-20 | House | In the House |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-7) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |