PA SB461 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency, further providing for organization.
Title
In Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency, further providing for organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 461 PN 469, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 461 PN 469, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-09-21 | House | In the House |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-19) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |