PA SB457 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for qualifications of Governor, Lieutenant Governor and Attorney General and for disqualification for offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor and Attorney General.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for qualifications of Governor, Lieutenant Governor and Attorney General and for disqualification for offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor and Attorney General.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |