PA SB446 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-19 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-19 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for drug and alcohol recovery houses and establishing the Drug and Alcohol Recovery House Fund; and making editorial changes.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for drug and alcohol recovery houses and establishing the Drug and Alcohol Recovery House Fund; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 446 PN 1387, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, 2017 A5262, FARRY (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, 2017 A5262, SUSP RULES, FARRY (Y: 170 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Motion to Revert to Prior Printer's Number 1082 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05234 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1088, 2017 A2960, CUTLER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02945 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 986, 2017 A2817, FARRY (Y: 187 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 986, 2017 A2778, FARRY (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1024, MOT REV PRIOR PR, CUTLER (Y: 111 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02299 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 446 PN 986, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 446 PN 1387, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, 2017 A5262, FARRY (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1379, 2017 A5262, SUSP RULES, FARRY (Y: 170 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Motion to Revert to Prior Printer's Number 1082 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05234 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1088, 2017 A2960, CUTLER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02945 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 986, 2017 A2817, FARRY (Y: 187 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 986, 2017 A2778, FARRY (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 446 PN 1024, MOT REV PRIOR PR, CUTLER (Y: 111 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02299 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 446 PN 986, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-19 | Senate | Act No. 59 |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-12-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Final passage (192-0) |
2017-12-12 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2017-12-11 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-11 | House | Reverted to Prior Printer's No. 1082 in Appropriations |
2017-07-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-11 | House | Amended on third consideration, (not reprinted) |
2017-07-10 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2017-07-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-07-07 | House | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No.986 (111-79) |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-06-21 | House | In the House |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |