PA SB445 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act No. 23 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act No. 23 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for breast cancer research.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for contributions for breast cancer research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: SB 445 PN 636, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 445 PN 636, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: SB 445 PN 636, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 445 PN 636, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act No. 23 of 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-12 | House | In the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |