PA SB442 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring notification in advertising.
Title
Requiring notification in advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 442 PN 1449, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1449, FP (Y: 116 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1449, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 169 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-04 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1442, 2015 A4692, O'NEILL (Y: 185 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-04 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1442, 2015 A4637, BROWN, V. (Y: 82 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04461 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04461 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 442 PN 391, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1449, FP (Y: 116 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1449, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 169 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-04 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1442, 2015 A4692, O'NEILL (Y: 185 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-12-04 - House - House Floor: SB 442 PN 1442, 2015 A4637, BROWN, V. (Y: 82 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04461 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04461 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 442 PN 391, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-20 | Senate | Act No. 90 |
2015-12-20 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-12-05 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-12-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (116-73) |
2015-12-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-12-03 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-06 | House | In the House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |