PA SB437 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 9
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 9
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for the adoption of regulations.
Title
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for the adoption of regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-27 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-18 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-18 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-13 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-13 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2007-06-12 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2007-06-11 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-06-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-23 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS | |
2007-03-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-19 | Second consideration | |
2007-03-13 | First consideration | |
2007-03-13 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-05 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=437 |