PA SB435 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for transportation fueling infrastructure development.
Title
In restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for transportation fueling infrastructure development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 474 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |