PA SB431 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in nuisances, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish; in rules of the road in general, providing for duty of driver in litter enforcement corridors; and, in powers of department and local authorities, providing for designation of litter enforcement corridors and further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Title
In nuisances, further providing for the offense of scattering rubbish; in rules of the road in general, providing for duty of driver in litter enforcement corridors; and, in powers of department and local authorities, providing for designation of litter enforcement corridors and further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Arthur Haywood [D] | Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 431 PN 1872, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 431 PN 1872, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07526 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 431 PN 948, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 431 PN 1872, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 431 PN 1872, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07526 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 431 PN 948, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 62 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-07-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-07-08 | House | In the House |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |