PA SB422 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards; in ballots, further providing for forms of ballots, printing ballots, numbers; in electronic voting systems, further providing for forms, for election day procedures and the process of voting and for post election procedures; in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of applying to vote, persons entitled to vote, voter's certificates, entries to be made in district register, numbered lists of voters, challenges and for deadline for receipt of valid voter registration application; in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots, for approval of application for absentee ballot, for absentee and mail-in electors files and lists, for official absentee voters ballots, for envelopes for official absentee ballots, for delivering or mailing ballots, for voting by absentee electors, for canvassing of official absentee ballots and mail-in ballots and for public records and repealing provisions relating to violation of provisions relating to absentee voting; in voting by qualified mail-in electors, further providing for qualified mail-in electors, for applications for official mail-in ballots, for approval of application for mail-in ballot, for official mail-in elector ballots, for envelopes for official mail-in ballots, for voting by mail-in electors and for public records and repealing provisions relating to violation of provisions relating to mail-in voting; providing for Pennsylvania Election Law Advisory Board; in penalties, further providing for violations of provisions relating to absentee electors ballots; providing for emergency provisions for 2020 general primary election; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards; in ballots, further providing for forms of ballots, printing ballots, numbers; in electronic voting systems, further providing for forms, for election day procedures and the process of voting and for post election procedures; in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of applying to vote, persons entitled to vote, voter's certificates, entries to be made in district register, numbered lists of voters, challenges and for deadline for receipt of valid voter registration application; in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots, for approval of application for absentee ballot, for absentee and mail-in electors files and lists, for official absentee voters ballots, for envelopes for official absentee ballots, for delivering or mailing ballots, for voting by absentee electors, for canvassing of official absentee ballots and mail-in ballots and for public records and repealing provisions relating to violation of provisions relating to absentee voting; in voting by qualified mail-in electors, further providing for qualified mail-in electors, for applications for official mail-in ballots, for approval of application for mail-in ballot, for official mail-in elector ballots, for envelopes for official mail-in ballots, for voting by mail-in electors and for public records and repealing provisions relating to violation of provisions relating to mail-in voting; providing for Pennsylvania Election Law Advisory Board; in penalties, further providing for violations of provisions relating to absentee electors ballots; providing for emergency provisions for 2020 general primary election; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 422 PN 1608, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House Floor: SB 422 PN 1608, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House Floor: SB 422 PN 1600, 2019 A4879, EVERETT (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Floor: SB 422 PN 399, 2019 A4870, EVERETT (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 422 PN 399, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateAct No. 12
2020-03-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-03-25SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-03-25SenateSigned in House
2020-03-25SenateSigned in Senate
2020-03-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
2020-03-25SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-03-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-03-25SenateIn the Senate
2020-03-25HouseFinal passage (198-0)
2020-03-25HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2020-03-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-03-24HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-03-24HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2020-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2020-03-23HouseFirst consideration
2020-03-23HouseReported as committed
2019-06-26HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-25HouseIn the House
2019-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (28-22)
2019-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-03-12SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=422
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0422&pn=0399
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0422&pn=1600
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0422&pn=1608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/23/2020&RollCallId=1740
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1139
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=03/25/2020&RollCallId=758
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/25/2020&RollCallId=1748

Bill Comments

feedback