PA SB417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in party organization, further providing for who shall be declared elected members of national or State committee and party offices; and, in returns of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of computing irregular ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In party organization, further providing for who shall be declared elected members of national or State committee and party offices; and, in returns of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of computing irregular ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 417 PN 1652, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-21HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-04-21HouseIn the House
2020-04-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (35-15)
2020-04-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-01-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-18SenateReported as committed
2019-03-19SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=417
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0417&pn=0436
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0417&pn=1652
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=612
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/28/2020&RollCallId=718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=428

Bill Comments

feedback