PA SB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school finances, providing for millage rate increase.
Title
In school finances, providing for millage rate increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |