PA SB405 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating Exit 30 from Interstate 84 onto State Route 402, in Pike County, as the Corporal Bryon K. Dickson, II, Exit.
Title
Designating Exit 30 from Interstate 84 onto State Route 402, in Pike County, as the Corporal Bryon K. Dickson, II, Exit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 405 PN 1075, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 405 PN 1075, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02245 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02245 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 405 PN 378, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 405 PN 1075, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02245 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02245 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 405 PN 378, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 35 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-23 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-13 | House | In the House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |