PA SB402 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the fifteenth day of the Hindu lunisolar month of Kartik as "Diwali Day" in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the fifteenth day of the Hindu lunisolar month of Kartik as "Diwali Day" in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 402 PN 346, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-26 | House | In the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |