PA SB399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in election of officers and vacancies in office, further providing for supervisors.
Title
In election of officers and vacancies in office, further providing for supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 399 PN 399, FP (Y: 186 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 399, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 399 PN 399, FP (Y: 186 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 399 PN 399, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Act No. 28 |
2017-07-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-07-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-09 | House | Signed in House |
2017-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-2) |
2017-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-04-26 | House | In the House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |