PA SB398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Act No. 79 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Act No. 79 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions, for State Board of Medicine and for physician assistants; and abrogating regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for State Board of Medicine and for physician assistants; and abrogating regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 1084, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House Floor: SB 398 PN 1084, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02236 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 871, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 1084, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - House - House Floor: SB 398 PN 1084, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02236 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 398 PN 871, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Senate | Act No. 79 of 2021 |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-09-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-09-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-22 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-06-25 | House | In the House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |