PA SB397 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking, for private cause of action and for third party sureties.
Title
In bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking, for private cause of action and for third party sureties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: SB 397 PN 1058 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 397 PN 1058, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - SB 397 PN 1058 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 397 PN 1058, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: SB 397 PN 1027, 2015 A2028, MARSICO (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01741 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01741 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 397 PN 305, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 397 PN 1058, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - SB 397 PN 1058 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 397 PN 1058, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: SB 397 PN 1027, 2015 A2028, MARSICO (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01741 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01741 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 397 PN 305, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 16 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-02-18 | House | In the House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |