PA SB396 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 35000, on that portion of State Route 2040 in Bentleyville Borough, Washington County, as the Mrs. Madeline Finney Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 35000, on that portion of State Route 2040 in Bentleyville Borough, Washington County, as the Mrs. Madeline Finney Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 396 PN 384, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 396 PN 384, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | House | In the House |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |