PA SB391 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 6, 1980 (P.L.197, No.57), known as the Optometric Practice and Licensure Act, further providing for definitions, for approval of drugs, for exemptions and exceptions and for violations and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for approval of drugs, for exemptions and exceptions and for violations and penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-05SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-22SenateReported as amended
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback