PA SB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in enforcement, further providing for jurisdiction and penalties; and, in game or wildlife protection, further providing for the offense of unlawful taking and possession of protected birds and for endangered or threatened species.
Title
In enforcement, further providing for jurisdiction and penalties; and, in game or wildlife protection, further providing for the offense of unlawful taking and possession of protected birds and for endangered or threatened species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 377 PN 1401, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2020-05-27 | House | In the House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |