PA SB363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for prohibition against employment assistance.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for prohibition against employment assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |