PA SB359 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in enforcing attendance, further providing for definitions; providing for attendance policy at charter and cyber charter schools; further providing for reports of enrollments, attendance and withdrawals and public and private schools, and for penalties for violation of compulsory attendance requirements; providing for procedure by school when child habitually truant, for procedure upon filing of citation, for penalties for violating compulsory school attendance requirements and for study of truancy procedure; repealing provisions relating to suspension of operating privilege; in charter schools, further providing for provisions applicable to charter schools and for applicability of other provisions of this act and of other acts and regulations; and, in disruptive student programs, further providing for definitions.
Title
In enforcing attendance, further providing for definitions; providing for attendance policy at charter and cyber charter schools; further providing for reports of enrollments, attendance and withdrawals and public and private schools, and for penalties for violation of compulsory attendance requirements; providing for procedure by school when child habitually truant, for procedure upon filing of citation, for penalties for violating compulsory school attendance requirements and for study of truancy procedure; repealing provisions relating to suspension of operating privilege; in charter schools, further providing for provisions applicable to charter schools and for applicability of other provisions of this act and of other acts and regulations; and, in disruptive student programs, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 359 PN 1766, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2016-05-10 | House | In the House |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |