PA SB358 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 9, 2018 (P.L.118, No.24), known as the Maternal Mortality Review Act, further providing for confidentiality and protection of collected data, proceedings and activities.
Title
Further providing for confidentiality and protection of collected data, proceedings and activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 358 PN 404, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2022-10-26 | House | In the House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |