PA SB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of aggravated assault by person in custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assault, providing for the offense of aggravated assault by person in custody.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-05-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-27SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-19SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-19SenateReported as committed
2017-02-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback