PA SB354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for definitions; providing for reporting of sanctions and criminal proceedings and for suspension; and further providing for civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for definitions; providing for reporting of sanctions and criminal proceedings and for suspension; and further providing for civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 1426, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05360 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 1426, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 171 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 1373, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 992, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02143 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02198 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateAct No. 6
2018-02-15SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-02-09SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-02-06SenateSigned in House
2018-02-06SenateSigned in Senate
2018-02-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0)
2018-02-05SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-01-24SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-01-23SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the House (184-0)
2018-01-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2017-12-12HouseReferred to RULES
2017-12-12HouseIn the House
2017-12-12SenateSenate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0)
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2017-06-28SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2017-06-28SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2017-06-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-27HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-27HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-21HouseReported as amended
2017-05-09HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-05-08HouseIn the House
2017-05-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2017-04-25SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-18SenateReported as amended
2017-02-15SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=354
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0354&pn=0348
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0354&pn=0710
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0354&pn=0992
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0354&pn=1373
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0354&pn=1426
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=97
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=90
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=691
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=692
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=788
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=559
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=360
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=975
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=679
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=412

Bill Comments

feedback