PA SB354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for definitions; providing for reporting of sanctions and criminal proceedings and for suspension; and further providing for civil penalties.
Title
Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for definitions; providing for reporting of sanctions and criminal proceedings and for suspension; and further providing for civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 1426, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05360 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 1426, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 171 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 1373, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 992, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02143 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02198 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05360 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 1426, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 354, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 171 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 1373, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 354 PN 992, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02143 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02198 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 354 PN 710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Act No. 6 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-01-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the House (184-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2017-12-12 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-12-12 | House | In the House |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-05-08 | House | In the House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |