PA SB341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in alternative form of regulation of telecommunications services, further providing for additional powers and duties of commission.
Title
In alternative form of regulation of telecommunications services, further providing for additional powers and duties of commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 341 PN 375, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2021-05-25 | House | In the House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-19) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |