PA SB332 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to operation of vehicles, providing for protection of children from second-hand smoke in vehicles; and imposing a penalty.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions relating to operation of vehicles, providing for protection of children from second-hand smoke in vehicles; and imposing a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Arthur Haywood [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 332 PN 330, A1555, AMENDMENT NO. A-1555 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (38-11) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |