PA SB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Act No. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in township supervisors, further providing for duties of supervisors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In township supervisors, further providing for duties of supervisors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 295, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 316 PN 295, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-27HouseAct No. 117
2019-12-27HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-12-18HousePresented to the Governor
2019-12-17HouseSigned in House
2019-12-18HouseSigned in Senate
2019-12-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-12-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-30HouseReported as committed
2019-05-02HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-05-01HouseIn the House
2019-05-01SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-04-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-04-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-08SenateSecond consideration
2019-03-26SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-26SenateReported as committed
2019-02-22SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=316
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0316&pn=0295
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=56
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=56
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=1325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1526

Bill Comments

feedback