PA SB314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Authority and the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Fund.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Authority and the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 314 PN 292, FP (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 314 PN 292, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 314 PN 292, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 108 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-23 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2019-06-12 | House | In the House |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |