PA SB312 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-09SenateLaid on the table
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as committed
2021-03-10SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback