PA SB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, in Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Program, further providing for fund.
Title
In Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Program, further providing for fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |