PA SB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 309 PN 286, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 309 PN 286, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2020-02-05 | House | In the House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |