PA SB305 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Title
Further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 305 PN 751, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2015-06-02 | House | In the House |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |