PA SB300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Human Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Human Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-22SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-26SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-26SenateReported as committed
2017-03-28SenateReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback