PA SB30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, providing for power to set fees; in fiscal affairs, further providing for collection fee for uncollectible checks; in fishing licenses, further providing for nonresident and tourist licenses, for one-day resident fishing license, for license, permit and issuing agent fees and for license and permit packaging options; in special licenses and permits, further providing for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for permits for protection and management of particular fish, for permits for the use of explosives, for Lake Erie fishing permits and for fishing guide and charter boat permits; in regulated fishing lakes, further providing for licenses and for fees; in dams, bar racks and migration devices, further providing for obstructing migration of fish; in preliminary provisions, further providing for fees; and, in registration and titling of boats, further providing for issuing agents, for fees and for notice for boats and related equipment.
Title
In Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, providing for power to set fees; in fiscal affairs, further providing for collection fee for uncollectible checks; in fishing licenses, further providing for nonresident and tourist licenses, for one-day resident fishing license, for license, permit and issuing agent fees and for license and permit packaging options; in special licenses and permits, further providing for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for permits for protection and management of particular fish, for permits for the use of explosives, for Lake Erie fishing permits and for fishing guide and charter boat permits; in regulated fishing lakes, further providing for licenses and for fees; in dams, bar racks and migration devices, further providing for obstructing migration of fish; in preliminary provisions, further providing for fees; and, in registration and titling of boats, further providing for issuing agents, for fees and for notice for boats and related equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 30 PN 11, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2017-03-27 | House | In the House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |