PA SB297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 17, 2008 (P.L.1645, No.132), known as the Home Improvement Consumer Protection Act, further providing for definitions, for registration of contractors, for home improvement fraud and for prohibited acts.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for registration of contractors, for home improvement fraud and for prohibited acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |