PA SB284 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in environmental protection, providing for decommissioning of solar energy facilities.
Title
In environmental protection, providing for decommissioning of solar energy facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 1578, Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 904, 2021 A3899, MUTH Amendment No. A-3899 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 904, 2021 A3939, YAW Amendment No. A-3939 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 1578, Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 904, 2021 A3899, MUTH Amendment No. A-3899 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 284 PN 904, 2021 A3939, YAW Amendment No. A-3939 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-04-12 | House | In the House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (35-14) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (47-1) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |