PA SB284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1435, No.156), known as the Public Utility Confidential Security Information Disclosure Protection Act, further providing for definitions; providing for pipeline operation and emergency response plans; and further providing for prohibition.
Title
Further providing for definitions; providing for pipeline operation and emergency response plans; and further providing for prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |