PA SB28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for the rate of inheritance tax.
Title
In inheritance tax, further providing for the rate of inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |