PA SB277 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Act No. 21 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Act No. 21 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1987 (P.L.163, No.16), known as the Rural Pennsylvania Revitalization Act, in Center for Rural Pennsylvania, further providing for board of directors; establishing the Rural Population Revitalization Commission and providing for duties of the commission; and making a repeal.
Title
In Center for Rural Pennsylvania, further providing for board of directors; establishing the Rural Population Revitalization Commission and providing for duties of the commission; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 277 PN 1589, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: SB 277 PN 1589, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 162 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Floor: SB 277 PN 241, 2023 A4260 (Y: 156 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 277 PN 241, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 277 PN 1589, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: SB 277 PN 1589, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 162 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Floor: SB 277 PN 241, 2023 A4260 (Y: 156 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 277 PN 241, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Act No. 21 of 2024 |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Signed in House |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-1) |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2024-05-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-05-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (162-38) |
2024-05-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-05-06 | House | Removed from table |
2023-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2023-06-05 | House | In the House |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |